MA H3124 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4772

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require the Department of Highways to acquire a certain portion of Brook Street and Willet Pond Dam in the town of Norwood by eminent domain. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of Highways to acquire a certain dam in the town of Norwood

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-08HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4772
2019-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2356 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2020
S2081 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback