MA H3112 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4397
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to deceptive actions perpetrated against elderly and disabled persons. Elder Affairs.
Title
Increasing the penalties for unfair and deceptive actions perpetrated against persons with disabilities and senior citizens.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4397 |
2011-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4397 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3112 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14844&generalCourtId=1 |