MA H3108 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure fairness in care and protection proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
To ensure fairness in care and protection proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1608 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S537 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1497 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H602 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S2104 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
S2093 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
H3816 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Text of an amendment, see H3680
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1608 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S537 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1497 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1558 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3666
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H602 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S2104 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
S2093 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
H3816 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Text of an amendment, see H3680
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3108 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3108.pdf |