MA H3094 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restrict the use of certain signs on the Massachusetts Turnpike. Transportation.
Title
Relative to signs on the Massachusetts Turnpike
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/12/2014 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3094 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3094.pdf |