MA H3091 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Moran of Boston, a petition of Michael J. Moran and others for the annual issuance of a proclamation by the Governor setting apart the sixteenth day of June as domestic workers’ rights day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating Domestic Workers’ Rights Day
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moran [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3091.pdf |