MA H3091 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Walsh of Peabody, a petition of Thomas P. Walsh that the commissioner of the Department of Revenue be authorized to generate and provide to local boards of assessors and the registrar of motor vehicles a detailed description of each circumstance that may warrant a motor vehicle abatement or exemption. Revenue.
Title
Relative to excise tax on motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5247 |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
S2347 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2347 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
S2353 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3091.pdf |