MA H3083 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5028

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5028
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to hardship licenses and interlocking ignition devices on motorcycles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To allow hardship licenses and interlocking ignition devices on motorcycles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-08HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5028
2020-07-20SenateSenate concurred
2020-07-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-06-01HouseReporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-27HouseHouse concurred
2020-03-23SenateReporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3043 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3020 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3071 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3182 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2091 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2094 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5028 (Replaced by) 2020-10-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback