MA H3080 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to payments in lieu of taxation by organizations exempt from the property tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to payments in lieu of taxation by organizations exempt from the property tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5279 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1874 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3080 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3080.pdf |