MA H3077 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Revenue to collect unpaid amounts of restitution payments to victims of crime by withholding wages of offenders. Revenue.
Title
Relative to timely restitution payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1861 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2339 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S1181 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2918
S1871 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1861 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1069 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2339 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S1181 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2918
S1871 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3077 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3077.pdf |