MA H3074 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the East Boston section of the city of Boston. Transportation.
Title
Improving the accessibility of certain Massport environmental data relative to East Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2481 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2959 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1600 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2572 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1562 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2382 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2959 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1600 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2572 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1562 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2382 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3074 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3074.pdf |