MA H3070 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Kilcoyne of Clinton and Senator Cronin, a joint petition of Meghan Kilcoyne and John J. Cronin that the commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey certain land in the town of Lancaster to Robert F. Kennedy Community Alliance, Inc.. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey certain land in the town of Lancaster to Robert F. Kennedy Community Alliance, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3578 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2024
H2571 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
H3672 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4300
H4300 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2571 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
H3672 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4300
H4300 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3070 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3070.pdf |