MA H3578 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to validating the results of the annual town election held in the town of Lancaster. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validating the results of the annual town election held in the town of Lancaster

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-12 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2024
2024-02-05SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2024-02-01HouseEnacted
2024-01-29SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2024-01-29SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2023-10-19SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-08-17SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-08-14HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-07-26HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-07-26HouseRules suspended
2023-07-26HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-06-29HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-05-11JointHearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H2571 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2023
H3672 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4300
H4300 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - New draft substituted, see H4701
H4701 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback