MA H3058 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a twenty-five percent personal income tax credit for the purchase and installation of plants and landscaping items intended to reduce water usage. Revenue.
Title
To promote water conservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1841 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1821 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2820 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2940 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1841 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1821 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2820 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2940 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3058 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3058.pdf |