MA H3053 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to information provided to relevant state agencies upon the submission of applications for state grant funding. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to transparency for grant applications
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4675 |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3566 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4593
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-07-19 - Reported by H4890
H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107
H4890 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2024
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-07-19 - Reported by H4890
H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107
H4890 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3053 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3053.pdf |