MA H3045 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the renewal of certain licenses after default on student loans. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Prohibiting license revocation for student loan default
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-07 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2229 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3045 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3045.pdf |