MA H3043 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Haddad of Somerset, a petition of Patricia A. Haddad for the issuance by the Governor of an annual proclamation setting apart the month of October as Dysautonomia and POTS awareness month. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating Dysautonomia & POTS awareness month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-01-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3044 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2003 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2003 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3043 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3043.pdf |