MA H3037 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fees and fines assessed on EZ-Pass account holders. Transportation.
Title
To protect motorists from excessive EZ-Pass fees and fines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4772 |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2685 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H511 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3431 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2118 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3353 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S790 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S553 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1190 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2104 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
H511 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3431 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2118 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3353 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S790 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S553 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1190 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
S2103 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2104 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3898 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2019
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3037 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3037.pdf |