MA H3026 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retired police cruisers. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to retired police cruisers
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H880 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1325 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1402 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1379 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H1141 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H880 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1325 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1402 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1379 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017
H1141 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3026 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3026.pdf |