MA H3023 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulation of privatization contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to regulation of privatization contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2511 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3165 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S908 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H3983 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4566 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H3165 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S908 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H3983 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4566 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3023 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3023.pdf |