MA H3023 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 244 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 244 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Milford be authorized to eliminate the requirement for the Milford Geriatric Authority to make payments to said town in lieu of taxes. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Eliminating the requirement for the geriatric authority to make payment to the town of Milford in lieu of taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 244 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-10-17 | House | Enacted |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-05-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-05-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4267 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4668
H4275 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 242 of the Acts of 2022
H4556 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2022
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4267 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4668
H4275 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 242 of the Acts of 2022
H4556 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3023 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3023.pdf |