MA H3023 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the speed limit on certain highways. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish the speed limit on certain highways

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2999 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H1334 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3034 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3078 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S2060 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3917 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback