MA H2998 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4771
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to participation in public meetings. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To modernize participation in public meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] |
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4771 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4771 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2998 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2998.pdf |