MA H2994 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further regulating access to public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further regulating access to public records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2023-07-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H1599 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback