MA H2987 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Balser of Newton, a petition of Ruth B. Balser, Patricia D. Jehlen and Rebecca L. Rausch for the annual issuance of a proclamation by the Governor setting apart March 10 as COVID-19 remembrance day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To establish a COVID-19 Remembrance Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-03-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2012 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H3016 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H3016 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2987 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2987.pdf |