MA H2983 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish transit improvement districts. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing transit improvement districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S951 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H569 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H866 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
S85 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H113 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback