MA H2974 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for credit against taxes for the costs of certain advertising campaigns that feature digitally unaltered images of human models. Revenue.
Title
Relative to mental health promotion through realistic advertising images
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5279 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1972 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H616 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S1275 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H616 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S1275 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2974 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2974.pdf |