MA H2963 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-05 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to payments in lieu of taxation by organizations exempt from the property tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to payments in lieu of taxation by organizations exempt from the property tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1836 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2963 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2963.pdf |