MA S1836 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to payments in lieu of taxation by organizations exempt from the property tax. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to payments in lieu of taxation by organizations exempt from the property tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4072 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2024

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback