MA H2945 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create the position of poet laureate of the Commonwealth. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the position of poet laureate for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2020-02-26HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2020-02-26HouseAccompanied by H2946
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development

Same As/Similar To

H2946 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied H2945
H2947 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback