MA H2944 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Ayers of Quincy, a petition of Bruce J. Ayers and Tackey Chan that the Highway Department evaluate certain improvements at the Furnace Brook Parkway Rotary Intersection in the city of Quincy. Transportation.
Title
Relative to public safety at the Furnace Brook Parkway in the city of Quincy
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4438 |
2016-01-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2016 from 12:15 PM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
H617 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H617 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2944 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2944.pdf |