MA H2930 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to conversion of fossil fuel heating customers to heat pumps, solar thermal, or other renewable or low greenhouse gas emissions heating technologies. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Sparking the modernization of state heat systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H778 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H2220 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
H2220 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2930 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2930.pdf |