MA H2929 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2426
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - New draft (Lewis) substituted, see S2426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - New draft (Lewis) substituted, see S2426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the viability of designating a space or facility in the city of Boston commemorating the visit of Nelson Mandela. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Establishing a special commission to consider an appropriate tribute to Nelson Mandela in the City of Boston
Sponsors
Rep. Byron Rushing [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | New draft (Lewis) substituted, see S2426 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Read second |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Read |
2016-06-27 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-05-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-05-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-11 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2015-11-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2426 (Replaced by) 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2929 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2929.pdf |