MA H2922 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4472
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to merging the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority police department into the department of state police. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To increase the homeland security of the Commonwealth by merging the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority police department into the department of state police
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Rep. Kathi-Anne Reinstein [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] |
Sen. Michael Rush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4472 |
2012-02-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-11-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4472 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2922 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12335&generalCourtId=1 |