MA H2893 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to freezing of the rate and valuation of taxes on real income to protect elder housing. Revenue.
Title
To protect elder housing
Sponsors
Rep. Samantha Montano [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2893 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2893.pdf |