MA H2893 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the reimbursement of nursing homes for care and services provided to accountable care organization patients. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to nursing facility care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4659 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S336 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H340 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2072 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4787
H2070 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4659 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H340 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2072 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4787
H2070 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4659 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2893 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2893.pdf |