MA H340 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the licensure of skilled nursing facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
To improve the licensure of skilled nursing facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4659 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S336 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
H140 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1166 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H1053 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1290 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H4659 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H140 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1166 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H1053 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1290 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H4659 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H340 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H340.pdf |