MA H2884 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt owners from providing an indemnity for certain lost or stolen registered bonds. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Exempting owners from providing an indemnity for certain lost or stolen registered bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/26/2014 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2884 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2884.pdf |