MA H2864 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4109
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 97-7)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of tobacco products in primary and secondary school buildings or facilities. Education.
Title
To protect youth from the health risks of tobacco and nicotine addiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4109 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-03-29 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1217 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
S1188 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1576 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3998
H1180 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
S930 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H115 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H803 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4109 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
S1188 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
S1576 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3998
H1180 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
S930 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H115 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H803 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4109 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - New draft substituted, see H4479
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2864 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2864.pdf |