MA H2859 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to impose an excise tax on distributors of certain drinks with added sugar and promoting healthy alternatives to such drinks. Revenue.
Title
To promote healthy alternatives to sugary drinks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1861 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2859 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2859.pdf |