MA H2852 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1855

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote urban agriculture and horticulture by providing for certain tax exemptions. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote urban agriculture and horticulture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-04-18HouseRules suspended
2024-04-18HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-03-25HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-03-25HouseAccompanied by S1855
2023-10-19JointHearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S354 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2614
H3932 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H4310 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4423 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1855 (Replaces) 2024-03-25 - Accompanied H2852
H4782 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback