MA H2833 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize voluntary contributions on income tax returns for a separate fund to be known as the Massachusetts fund for vulnerable countries most affected by climate change. Revenue.
Title
To allow individual donations to countries vulnerable to climate change
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H877 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H2890 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H983 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4744
H980 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S501
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S571 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
H2890 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H983 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4744
H980 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied S501
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S571 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2833 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2833.pdf |