MA H2832 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-14 - New draft substituted, see H4303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-14 - New draft substituted, see H4303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to recognize the profession of interior designers to bid on state contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Recognizing the profession of interior designers to bid on state contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Kathi-Anne Reinstein [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | House | New draft substituted, see H4303 |
2014-07-14 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2014-07-14 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4303 |
2013-09-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-09-19 | House | Accompanied by S1464 and S1557 |
2013-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1464 (Replaces) 2013-09-19 - Accompanied H2832
S1557 (Replaces) 2013-09-19 - Accompanied H2832
H4303 (Replaced by) 2014-08-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2014
S1557 (Replaces) 2013-09-19 - Accompanied H2832
H4303 (Replaced by) 2014-08-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2832 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2832.pdf |