MA H2823 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4860
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-24)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting emerging breweries. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To promote economic development and market access for emerging businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4860 |
2018-07-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-25 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2017-09-08 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-08-29 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 428 |
2017-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S81 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4397
S180 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H4702 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Rejected
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4714 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Published as amended, see H4732
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2625 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - See H4732
S2635 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - See H4732
H4860 (Replaced by) 2018-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S81 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4397
S180 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H4702 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Rejected
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4714 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Published as amended, see H4732
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2625 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - See H4732
S2635 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - See H4732
H4860 (Replaced by) 2018-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2823 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2823.pdf |