MA H2812 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing certain tax credits for employers of agricultural workers and labor rights for agricultural laborers. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing fairness for agricultural laborers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-10-19JointHearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2903 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2886 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2925 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2946 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
H2957 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback