MA H2802 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to rental housing deleading income tax credit. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To further lead remediation in rental housing by increasing the deleading credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23JointHearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1844 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H3723 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4092 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2623 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback