MA S1844 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further lead remediation in rental housing by increasing the deleading credit. Revenue.
Title
To further lead remediation in rental housing by increasing the deleading credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3723 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2802 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H4092 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2623 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2802 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H4092 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2623 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1844 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1844.pdf |