MA H2797 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create a tax credit for remote learning expenses. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a tax credit for remote learning expenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2411 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H4004 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2533 (Similar To) 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback