MA H2775 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the growth of the state budget. Ways and Means.
Title
Relative to the fiscally responsible budget growth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4481 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-12-18 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S280 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2429
S217 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S223 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S203 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S241 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H252 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H2042 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S217 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S223 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S203 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S241 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H252 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H2042 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2775 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2775.pdf |