MA H2751 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to removing certain accessibility restrictions on public records. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to restricted vital records
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moran [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] |
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Sen. Joseph Boncore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H236 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H2689 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1354 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2808
S911 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1814 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2676 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1838 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1825 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2689 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1354 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2808
S911 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1814 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2676 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1838 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1825 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2751 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2751.pdf |