MA H2747 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to support affordable housing with a local option for a fee to be applied to certain real estate transactions. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting a local option for a real estate transfer fee to fund affordable housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-10-03JointHearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H3804 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H3736 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4063 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2466 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4151 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback